Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Ethics (G2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Public Ethics - Gifts and Lobbyist Registration (Public Integrity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB0004)
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Retaliation for Reporting or Participating in Investigation - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Board of Ethics – Financial Disclosure Statements – Late Fees MC/PG 102–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980
Title
Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Definition of Application PG 416-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1058
Title
Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229
Title
Public Ethics - Local Officials - Electronic Filing of Financial Disclosure Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 (HB0363)
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Retaliation for Reporting or Participating in Investigation - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0292 Public Ethics - Gifts and Lobbyist Registration (Public Integrity Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0363 (SB0004) Maryland Public Ethics Law - Retaliation for Reporting or Participating in Investigation - Prohibition Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0501 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Board of Ethics – Financial Disclosure Statements – Late Fees MC/PG 102–21 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0980 Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Definition of Application PG 416-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1058 Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1229 Public Ethics - Local Officials - Electronic Filing of Financial Disclosure Statements Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0004 (HB0363) Maryland Public Ethics Law - Retaliation for Reporting or Participating in Investigation - Prohibition Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/16/2021 12:35 PM
Click to return on the top page