Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Gaming -see also- Awards; Bingo; Casinos; Lottery; Raffles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports and Event Wagering Business Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 (SB0045)
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0452)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818 (SB0558)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859 (SB0797)
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 (SB0024)
Title
Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc.
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093
Title
Real Property - Emergency Services and Nuisance Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224 (SB0850)
Title
Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Long Shot's
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298
Title
Gaming - Distribution of Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024 (HB0897)
Title
Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 (HB0388)
Title
Use of Gaming Proceeds - Studies
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243
Title
Public High Schools - Health Education - Gambling Dangers and Addiction
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0532)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0818)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 (HB0859)
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB1224)
Title
Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Long Shot’s
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871
Title
Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Washington County Minor League Baseball Team
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports and Event Wagering Business Entities Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0371 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0388 (SB0045) State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0403 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0532 (SB0452) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0818 (SB0558) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0859 (SB0797) Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0897 (SB0024) Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc. Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0940 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1093 Real Property - Emergency Services and Nuisance Actions Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1224 (SB0850) Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Long Shot's Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1298 Gaming - Distribution of Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0024 (HB0897) Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc. Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 (HB0388) Use of Gaming Proceeds - Studies Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0243 Public High Schools - Health Education - Gambling Dangers and Addiction Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2021 - 3:00 PM
SB0452 (HB0532) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB0818) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0797 (HB0859) Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0850 (HB1224) Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Long Shot’s Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Washington County Minor League Baseball Team Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:24 AM
Click to return on the top page