Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Gangs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0198)
Title
Criminal Gang Offenses – Penalties, Procedure, and Elements
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1702 (SB1147)
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 (HB0102)
Title
Criminal Gang Offenses - Penalties, Procedure, and Elements
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1147 (HB1702)
Title
Juveniles – Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 (SB0198) Criminal Gang Offenses – Penalties, Procedure, and Elements Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1702 (SB1147) Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 (HB0102) Criminal Gang Offenses - Penalties, Procedure, and Elements President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1147 (HB1702) Juveniles – Reportable Offenses Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM