Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Garrett County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 (SB0310)
Title
Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - Storage
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 (SB0369/CH0045)
Title
Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464 /CH0245 (SB0371/CH0244)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504 (SB0370/CH0463)
Title
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB0423)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Adventure Sports Center International Site
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0387 (SB0767)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 /CH0657
Title
Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990
Title
Garrett County - Deer Hunting - Three-Point Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 (HB0451)
Title
Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - Storage
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0369 /CH0045 (HB0452)
Title
Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 /CH0463 (HB0504)
Title
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0244 (HB0464/CH0245)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423 (HB0611)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Adventure Sports Center International Site
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 (HB0749/CH0387)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0451 (SB0310) Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - Storage Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0452 (SB0369/CH0045) Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0464 /CH0245 (SB0371/CH0244) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0504 (SB0370/CH0463) Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0611 (SB0423) Creation of a State Debt - Adventure Sports Center International Site Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0701 Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 /CH0387 (SB0767) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0957 /CH0657 Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 Garrett County - Deer Hunting - Three-Point Rule Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
SB0310 (HB0451) Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - Storage Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0369 /CH0045 (HB0452) Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0370 /CH0463 (HB0504) Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0371 /CH0244 (HB0464/CH0245) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0423 (HB0611) Creation of a State Debt - Adventure Sports Center International Site Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
SB0767 (HB0749/CH0387) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations Senator Edwards 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM