Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Garrett County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 /CH0071
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 (SB0642)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 (SB0255)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Emergency Operations Center
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0243 (SB0254)
Title
Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event License
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690
Title
Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Maryland Municipalities)
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0196)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 (SB0870)
Title
Garrett County - Memorial Hospital - Board of Governors
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB0356/CH0243)
Title
Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 (HB0319)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Emergency Operations Center
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0155)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 /CH0194
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event License
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 (HB1261)
Title
Garrett County - Memorial Hospital - Board of Governors
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 /CH0071 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0155 (SB0642) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0319 (SB0255) Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Emergency Operations Center Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB0356 /CH0243 (SB0254) Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0523 Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event License Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0690 Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Maryland Municipalities) Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0196) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1261 (SB0870) Garrett County - Memorial Hospital - Board of Governors Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 (HB0356/CH0243) Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0255 (HB0319) Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Emergency Operations Center Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 (HB0155) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0715 /CH0194 Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event License Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0870 (HB1261) Garrett County - Memorial Hospital - Board of Governors Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page