Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Garrett County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758 (SB0591/CH0695)
Title
Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 (SB1047)
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 /CH0144
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930 (SB0640)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973 (SB0787)
Title
Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1542 (SB1068)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Believe in Tomorrow Children's House at Deep Creek Lake
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 /CH0695 (HB0758)
Title
Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0930)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0973)
Title
Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 /CH0531 (HB1547)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979 /CH0694
Title
Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047 (HB0864)
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 (HB1542)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Believe in Tomorrow Children's House at Deep Creek Lake
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0758 (SB0591/CH0695) Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0864 (SB1047) Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 /CH0144 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Sunday Sales Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 (SB0640) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0973 (SB0787) Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1542 (SB1068) Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Believe in Tomorrow Children's House at Deep Creek Lake Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
SB0591 /CH0695 (HB0758) Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0930) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0787 (HB0973) Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0817 /CH0531 (HB1547) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0979 /CH0694 Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 (HB0864) Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1068 (HB1542) Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Believe in Tomorrow Children's House at Deep Creek Lake Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM