Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Garrett County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724 (SB0604)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Western Maryland Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853 (SB0718)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Bloomington Water Distribution System
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 /CH0275 (SB1032/CH0274)
Title
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0959)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401 /CH0169
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432
Title
Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1734 (SB1123/CH0701)
Title
Garrett County - Regulation of Animals - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1757 (SB1124)
Title
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 /CH0699
Title
Garrett County - Bids and Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0724)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0718 (HB0853)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Bloomington Water Distribution System
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB1122)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032 /CH0274 (HB0917/CH0275)
Title
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1123 /CH0701 (HB1734)
Title
Garrett County – Regulation of Animals – Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1124 (HB1757)
Title
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0724 (SB0604) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Western Maryland Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 (SB0718) Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Bloomington Water Distribution System Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0917 /CH0275 (SB1032/CH0274) Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1122 (SB0959) Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1401 /CH0169 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2018 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1432 Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot Program Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1734 (SB1123/CH0701) Garrett County - Regulation of Animals - Enforcement Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1757 (SB1124) Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0540 /CH0699 Garrett County - Bids and Contracts Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 699
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 (HB0724) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0718 (HB0853) Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Bloomington Water Distribution System Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0959 (HB1122) Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1032 /CH0274 (HB0917/CH0275) Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1123 /CH0701 (HB1734) Garrett County – Regulation of Animals – Enforcement Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1124 (HB1757) Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM