Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Garrett County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 /CH0593 (SB0216/CH0594)
Title
Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Garrett County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 /CH0115 (SB0215/CH0116)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0119 (SB0217/CH0120)
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0689 (SB0547/CH0690)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146 (SB0664)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 /CH0737
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1378 (SB0293)
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430 (SB1050)
Title
Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts
Sponsor
Minority Leader
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0010
Title
Commission to Rename Negro Mountain
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0116 (HB0276/CH0115)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 /CH0594 (HB0244/CH0593)
Title
Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 /CH0120 (HB0407/CH0119)
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 (HB1378)
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547 /CH0690 (HB0723/CH0689)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1146)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
Community Development - Rural Maryland Opportunity Zone Fund
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050 (HB1430)
Title
Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts
Sponsor
Minority Leader
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0244 /CH0593 (SB0216/CH0594) Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue Garrett County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0276 /CH0115 (SB0215/CH0116) Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation Allegany County Delegation 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0340 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 /CH0119 (SB0217/CH0120) Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0723 /CH0689 (SB0547/CH0690) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Revisions Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1146 (SB0664) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB1347 /CH0737 Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2019 - 12:45 PM
HB1378 (SB0293) Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1430 (SB1050) Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts Minority Leader 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0010 Commission to Rename Negro Mountain Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0116 (HB0276/CH0115) Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0216 /CH0594 (HB0244/CH0593) Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 /CH0120 (HB0407/CH0119) Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0293 (HB1378) Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0547 /CH0690 (HB0723/CH0689) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Revisions Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB1146) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0756 Community Development - Rural Maryland Opportunity Zone Fund Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
SB1050 (HB1430) Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts Minority Leader 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM