Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Garrett County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0095
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 (SB0643/CH0573)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787 /CH0327 (SB0354/CH0328)
Title
Garrett County - Overdue Property Tax - Interest Rate
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0925 (SB0864)
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Acquisition of Land, Water, or Easements in Garrett and Allegany Counties - Subdivision of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965 (SB0862)
Title
Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - Allegany County and Garrett County
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311 /CH0456 (SB0867)
Title
Natural Resources – Tree Expert License – Eligibility Criteria
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0012
Title
Commission to Rename Negro Mountain
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292 /CH0545
Title
Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 /CH0328 (HB0787/CH0327)
Title
Garrett County - Overdue Property Tax - Interest Rate
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 /CH0573 (HB0786)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 (HB0965)
Title
Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - Allegany County and Garrett County
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864 (HB0925)
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Acquisition of Land, Water, or Easements in Garrett and Allegany Counties - Subdivision of Property
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 (HB1311/CH0456)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Definition of "Tree Expert" - Alteration
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081 /CH0595
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 /CH0095 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 95
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0786 (SB0643/CH0573) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0787 /CH0327 (SB0354/CH0328) Garrett County - Overdue Property Tax - Interest Rate Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 327
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0925 (SB0864) Department of Natural Resources - Acquisition of Land, Water, or Easements in Garrett and Allegany Counties - Subdivision of Property Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0965 (SB0862) Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - Allegany County and Garrett County Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1311 /CH0456 (SB0867) Natural Resources – Tree Expert License – Eligibility Criteria Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 456
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1518 Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HJ0012 Commission to Rename Negro Mountain Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0292 /CH0545 Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 /CH0328 (HB0787/CH0327) Garrett County - Overdue Property Tax - Interest Rate Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 328
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0643 /CH0573 (HB0786) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020 Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0862 (HB0965) Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - Allegany County and Garrett County Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0864 (HB0925) Department of Natural Resources - Acquisition of Land, Water, or Easements in Garrett and Allegany Counties - Subdivision of Property Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0867 (HB1311/CH0456) Allegany County and Garrett County - Definition of "Tree Expert" - Alteration Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1081 /CH0595 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:21 PM