Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Gender -see also- Women

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0561
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 /CH0653 (SB0674/CH0654)
Title
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761
Title
Montgomery County - Democratic Party Central Committee - Membership - Gender Requirements MC 27-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001 (SB1015)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1222
Title
Maryland School Discipline Reform Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268
Title
Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1557 (SB1156)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 /CH0654 (HB0721/CH0653)
Title
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1015 (HB1001)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1156 (HB1557)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0355 /CH0561 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0721 /CH0653 (SB0674/CH0654) Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0761 Montgomery County - Democratic Party Central Committee - Membership - Gender Requirements MC 27-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1001 (SB1015) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1222 Maryland School Discipline Reform Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1268 Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act) Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1557 (SB1156) Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1648 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0674 /CH0654 (HB0721/CH0653) Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1015 (HB1001) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1156 (HB1557) Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM