Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Gender -see also- Women

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0039
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0062
Title
Procurement Contracts - Gender Wage Gap Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0064 (SB0137/CH0065)
Title
Health Insurance – Coverage for Male Sterilization – High–Deductible Health Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657 (SB1059)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or Gender
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB1028/CH0685)
Title
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0510 (SB0986/CH0511)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 /CH0154 (SB0066/CH0155)
Title
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238 (SB1203)
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1727
Title
Health Insurance - Infertility Treatment and In Vitro Fertilization - Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 /CH0155 (HB1159/CH0154)
Title
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0417
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory Harassment
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 /CH0511 (HB1024/CH0510)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028 /CH0685 (HB0902)
Title
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1059 (HB0657)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or Gender
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1203 (HB1238)
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex Delegate Robinson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0039 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0062 Procurement Contracts - Gender Wage Gap Reporting Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0135 /CH0064 (SB0137/CH0065) Health Insurance – Coverage for Male Sterilization – High–Deductible Health Plans Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0657 (SB1059) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or Gender Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0902 (SB1028/CH0685) Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act) Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report Adopted
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1024 /CH0510 (SB0986/CH0511) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 /CH0154 (SB0066/CH0155) Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1238 (SB1203) Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/01/2018 - 1:15 PM
HB1727 Health Insurance - Infertility Treatment and In Vitro Fertilization - Coverage Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0066 /CH0155 (HB1159/CH0154) Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0350 /CH0417 Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2018 - 12:45 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0525 Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory Harassment Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0986 /CH0511 (HB1024/CH0510) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1028 /CH0685 (HB0902) Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act) Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1059 (HB0657) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or Gender Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1203 (HB1238) Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM