Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

General Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0014
Title
Small Business Reserve Program - Procurements by Designated Procurement Units
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 (SB0036)
Title
State and County Governments - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State and County Building Grounds
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 /CH0415
Title
Coast Smart Council
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629 /CH0604
Title
Environmentally Preferable Procurement - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008 (SB0767)
Title
Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326 (SB0754)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0036 (HB0203)
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1326)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 (HB1008)
Title
Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0014 Small Business Reserve Program - Procurements by Designated Procurement Units Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0203 (SB0036) State and County Governments - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State and County Building Grounds Delegate Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0615 /CH0415 Coast Smart Council Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0629 /CH0604 Environmentally Preferable Procurement - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 (SB0767) Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1326 (SB0754) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/10/2014 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
SB0036 (HB0203) State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0754 (HB1326) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0767 (HB1008) Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM