Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

General Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0394
Title
Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 /CH0415 (SB0894)
Title
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0243 (SB0254)
Title
Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Reorganization of State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 /CH0302
Title
Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0916)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0012
Title
Task Force to Study Small and Minority Design Firm Participation in State Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB0356/CH0243)
Title
Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0381
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0894 (HB0349/CH0415)
Title
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 (HB1246)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0394 Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0349 /CH0415 (SB0894) Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0356 /CH0243 (SB0254) Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0698 Reorganization of State Procurement Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 /CH0302 Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 (SB0916) Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0109 /CH0012 Task Force to Study Small and Minority Design Firm Participation in State Procurement Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 (HB0356/CH0243) Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Senator Pinsky 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0381 State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0894 (HB0349/CH0415) Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0916 (HB1246) Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM