Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

General Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028
Title
Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353
Title
Reorganization of State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 (SB0020)
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 /CH0010 (SB0383)
Title
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500 (SB1086)
Title
Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 /CH0268
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Board of Directors - Appointing Authority for Federal Members
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0066 (SB0342/CH0065)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1497
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 (HB0391)
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 /CH0185
Title
Early Childhood Development - Transfer of Provisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342 /CH0065 (HB0837/CH0066)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1086 (HB0500)
Title
Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0353 Reorganization of State Procurement Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0391 (SB0020) State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0462 /CH0010 (SB0383) Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0500 (SB1086) Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in Maryland Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 /CH0268 Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Board of Directors - Appointing Authority for Federal Members Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0837 /CH0066 (SB0342/CH0065) State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement Contracts Delegate Haynes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1497 Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Health and Government Operations
SB0020 (HB0391) State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0282 /CH0185 Early Childhood Development - Transfer of Provisions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0342 /CH0065 (HB0837/CH0066) State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement Contracts Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1086 (HB0500) Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in Maryland Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM