Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

General Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 /CH0108
Title
Procurement - Department of General Services - Exemption for Historic Structures
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0386
Title
Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426 /CH0589 (SB0311/CH0588)
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 /CH0033 (SB0579/CH0675)
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701
Title
Procurement - Lease of Property for Local Departments of Social Services - Requests for Proposals
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0845
Title
Education - Public School Indoor Air Quality
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846 /CH0342
Title
Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program - Staff
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 (SB0704)
Title
Public Charter School Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0590
Title
Reorganization of State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290
Title
State Government - Management of Public Buildings - Indoor Air Quality
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1509
Title
Maryland Healthy Vending Choices Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 /CH0588 (HB0426/CH0589)
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579 /CH0675 (HB0664/CH0033)
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704 (HB0878)
Title
Public Charter School Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084 /CH0709 (HB0587/CH0708)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0060 Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0144 /CH0108 Procurement - Department of General Services - Exemption for Historic Structures Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0270 /CH0386 Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic Schools Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0426 /CH0589 (SB0311/CH0588) Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0664 /CH0033 (SB0579/CH0675) State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds Delegate Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0701 Procurement - Lease of Property for Local Departments of Social Services - Requests for Proposals Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0845 Education - Public School Indoor Air Quality Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 /CH0342 Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program - Staff Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0878 (SB0704) Public Charter School Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 /CH0590 Reorganization of State Procurement Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 State Government - Management of Public Buildings - Indoor Air Quality Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1509 Maryland Healthy Vending Choices Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0311 /CH0588 (HB0426/CH0589) Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0579 /CH0675 (HB0664/CH0033) State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0704 (HB0878) Public Charter School Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1084 /CH0709 (HB0587/CH0708) State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM