Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292 /CH0431
Title
Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Personalized Medicine - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 /CH0644
Title
Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1466
Title
Health - Genetically Modified Organisms in Food - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1523
Title
Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178
Title
Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0292 /CH0431 Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0826 Maryland Health Care Commission - Personalized Medicine - Study Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 /CH0644 Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1466 Health - Genetically Modified Organisms in Food - Study Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1523 Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM