Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0680
Title
Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 /CH0106
Title
Code Revision - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 (SB0778)
Title
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341
Title
Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0654 /CH0323
Title
Health - Down Syndrome - Required Information
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB1191)
Title
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0680 Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0999 /CH0106 Code Revision - Miscellaneous Provisions Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1191 (SB0778) Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1341 Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know Act Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0654 /CH0323 Health - Down Syndrome - Required Information Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0778 (HB1191) Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM