Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 /CH0244
Title
Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 (SB0498/CH0037)
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Accounting of Sexual Assault Evidence Kits
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 /CH0426 (SB0427)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Notification Regarding DNA Profile
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552 /CH0494 (SB0703)
Title
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754
Title
Sexual Assault - Survivors' Right to Know - DNA Analysis of Kit Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1000 (SB0583/CH0369)
Title
DNA Evidence - Postconviction Review
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Criminal Procedure - Statewide DNA Data Base System - Admissibility of DNA Match Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0427 (HB0501/CH0426)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Notification Regarding DNA Profile
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 /CH0037 (HB0462)
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Accounting of Sexual Assault Evidence Kits
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 /CH0369 (HB1000)
Title
DNA Evidence - Postconviction Review
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 (HB0552/CH0494)
Title
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0382 /CH0244 Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know Act Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0462 (SB0498/CH0037) Public Safety - Statewide Accounting of Sexual Assault Evidence Kits Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0501 /CH0426 (SB0427) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Notification Regarding DNA Profile Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0552 /CH0494 (SB0703) Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB0754 Sexual Assault - Survivors' Right to Know - DNA Analysis of Kit Evidence Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1000 (SB0583/CH0369) DNA Evidence - Postconviction Review Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (123-15)
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Criminal Procedure - Statewide DNA Data Base System - Admissibility of DNA Match Evidence Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0427 (HB0501/CH0426) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Notification Regarding DNA Profile Senator Lee 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0498 /CH0037 (HB0462) Public Safety - Statewide Accounting of Sexual Assault Evidence Kits Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 /CH0369 (HB1000) DNA Evidence - Postconviction Review Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0703 (HB0552/CH0494) Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0787 Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM