Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Public Safety - Crime Scene DNA Collection and Analysis - Status Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411 (SB0677)
Title
DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1489
Title
Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 /CH0009
Title
Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 (HB1411)
Title
DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 Public Safety - Crime Scene DNA Collection and Analysis - Status Reports Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1411 (SB0677) DNA Testing - Postconviction Review Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1489 Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0037 /CH0009 Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 (HB1411) DNA Testing - Postconviction Review Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM