Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395 (SB0423/CH0602)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125
Title
Evidence - Chain of Custody - DNA Profile
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1414
Title
Sickle–Cell Trait Screening, Treatment, Education, and Public Awareness (Journey’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107
Title
Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423 /CH0602 (HB0395)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0395 (SB0423/CH0602) Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Judiciary
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1125 Evidence - Chain of Custody - DNA Profile Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1414 Sickle–Cell Trait Screening, Treatment, Education, and Public Awareness (Journey’s Law) Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0423 /CH0602 (HB0395) Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM