Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Public Safety – DNA Analysis – Search of Data Base
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 (SB0369)
Title
Evidence - Chain of Custody of DNA
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 (SB0953)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 (SB0786)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0369 (HB0372)
Title
Evidence - Chain of Custody of DNA
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786 (HB1127)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0417 (HB0697/CH0418)
Title
Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953 (HB0856)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 Public Safety – DNA Analysis – Search of Data Base Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 (SB0369) Evidence - Chain of Custody of DNA Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0716 State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act) Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0856 (SB0953) Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2019 - 3:00 PM
HB1127 (SB0786) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019 Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0369 (HB0372) Evidence - Chain of Custody of DNA Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0786 (HB1127) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 /CH0417 (HB0697/CH0418) Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0953 (HB0856) Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM