Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0237 (SB0201)
Title
Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 (SB0547)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 (SB0274)
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0957)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096
Title
Evidence - Chain of Custody - DNA Profile
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 (SB0848)
Title
Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1560
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited PG/MC 103-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
State's Attorney - Required Disclosure - Facial Recognition and DNA Analysis and Search
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 (HB0237)
Title
Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0340)
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB1209)
Title
Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932
Title
Public Safety - DNA Collection - Criminal Offenses Relating to Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0784)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0096 Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0237 (SB0201) Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0255 (SB0547) Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0307 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0340 (SB0274) State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 (SB0957) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1096 Evidence - Chain of Custody - DNA Profile Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1179 Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1209 (SB0848) Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1560 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited PG/MC 103-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 State's Attorney - Required Disclosure - Facial Recognition and DNA Analysis and Search Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0201 (HB0237) Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0340) State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0848 (HB1209) Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0932 Public Safety - DNA Collection - Criminal Offenses Relating to Firearms Senator Hayes 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0957 (HB0784) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 8:11 PM