Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Good Samaritan

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009 /CH0393 (SB0105)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 (SB0303)
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 /CH0360 (SB0214)
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 (SB0344/CH0342)
Title
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0745 (SB0516/CH0356)
Title
Public Health - Overdose Response Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973
Title
Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992 (SB0672)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0654/CH0375)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Immunity - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Medical Emergencies
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0676)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214 (HB0368/CH0360)
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0303 (HB0222)
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0342 (HB0658)
Title
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0433 /CH0349
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Disposition
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0356 (HB0745)
Title
Public Health - Overdose Response Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0359
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assaults - Mandatory Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0654 /CH0375 (HB1009)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Immunity - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Medical Emergencies
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB0992)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB1021)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 /CH0393 (SB0105) Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0222 (SB0303) Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Dumais)
Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0368 /CH0360 (SB0214) Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose Delegate Beidle 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0658 (SB0344/CH0342) Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0745 (SB0516/CH0356) Public Health - Overdose Response Program Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0973 Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0992 (SB0672) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1009 (SB0654/CH0375) Criminal Procedure - Immunity - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Medical Emergencies Delegate Smith 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1021 (SB0676) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1103 Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0214 (HB0368/CH0360) Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose Anne Arundel County Senators 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0303 (HB0222) Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 /CH0342 (HB0658) Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0433 /CH0349 Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Disposition Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 /CH0356 (HB0745) Public Health - Overdose Response Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 /CH0359 Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 Higher Education - Sexual Assaults - Mandatory Reporting Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0654 /CH0375 (HB1009) Criminal Procedure - Immunity - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Medical Emergencies Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB0992) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0676 (HB1021) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM