Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 (SB0926)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955 (SB0050/CH0119)
Title
Crimes - Use of Personal Identifying Information or the Identity of Another - Sexual Crimes
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0050 /CH0119 (HB0955)
Title
Crimes - Use of Personal Identifying Information or the Identity of Another - Sexual Crimes
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB0847)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0847 (SB0926) Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0955 (SB0050/CH0119) Crimes - Use of Personal Identifying Information or the Identity of Another - Sexual Crimes Delegate Dumais 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0050 /CH0119 (HB0955) Crimes - Use of Personal Identifying Information or the Identity of Another - Sexual Crimes Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0926 (HB0847) Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM