Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Gratuities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 (SB0465)
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Electronic Bingo and Tip Jars - Distribution to Maryland State Arts Council
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0641)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 (HB0135)
Title
Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program and Admissions and Amusement Tax Distributions – Extensions and Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB1097)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 (SB0465) Admissions and Amusement Tax - Electronic Bingo and Tip Jars - Distribution to Maryland State Arts Council Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0641) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1628 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0465 (HB0135) Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program and Admissions and Amusement Tax Distributions – Extensions and Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0641 (HB1097) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2020 1:42 PM