Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Group Homes -see also- Assisted Living

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249 (SB0256)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299 (SB0336)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 (SB0412)
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679
Title
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919
Title
Property Tax Credit - Group Homes - Power Generators
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976 (SB0452)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125 (SB0388)
Title
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 (SB0939)
Title
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1444 (SB0960)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - St. Luke's House Property Renovations and Repairs
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460 (SB1010)
Title
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0249)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB0299)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home Renovations
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB1125)
Title
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0433)
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0976)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes Renovations
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678
Title
Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1307)
Title
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 (HB1444)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - St. Luke's House Property Renovations and Repairs
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1460)
Title
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0249 (SB0256) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0299 (SB0336) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home Renovations Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0433 (SB0412) Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0919 Property Tax Credit - Group Homes - Power Generators Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0976 (SB0452) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes Renovations Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB1125 (SB0388) Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 (SB0939) Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1444 (SB0960) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - St. Luke's House Property Renovations and Repairs Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB1460 (SB1010) Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0256 (HB0249) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0336 (HB0299) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home Renovations Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0388 (HB1125) Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0412 (HB0433) Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0452 (HB0976) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes Renovations Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0678 Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot Program Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1307) Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0960 (HB1444) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - St. Luke's House Property Renovations and Repairs Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB1010 (HB1460) Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM