Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Group Homes -see also- Assisted Living

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299 (SB0291)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Crownsville Treatment Center
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566 /CH0261
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Licensees Providing Services to Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Emergency Action
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 (SB0508/CH0180)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 (SB0861)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 (SB0201/CH0331)
Title
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109 /CH0469
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Powers, Duties, and Responsibilities
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0470
Title
Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238 (SB0151)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB1238)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes Renovations
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - TuTTie's Place
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 /CH0331 (HB0742)
Title
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 (HB0299)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Crownsville Treatment Center
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597
Title
Public Health - Immunizations - Related Institutions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB1022)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0661)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0299 (SB0291) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Crownsville Treatment Center Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 11:00 AM
HB0373 Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0566 /CH0261 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Licensees Providing Services to Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Emergency Action Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 (SB0508/CH0180) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0661 (SB0861) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Zucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0742 (SB0201/CH0331) State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1109 /CH0469 Behavioral Health Administration - Powers, Duties, and Responsibilities Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1172 /CH0470 Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB1238 (SB0151) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes Renovations Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0151 (HB1238) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes Renovations Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 10:30 AM
SB0170 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - TuTTie's Place Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
SB0201 /CH0331 (HB0742) State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0291 (HB0299) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Crownsville Treatment Center Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0597 Public Health - Immunizations - Related Institutions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 (HB1022) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0661) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM