Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Group Homes -see also- Assisted Living

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785
Title
Recovery Residences - Condition of Acceptance of State Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 /CH0584
Title
Maryland Mental Health Law - Small Private Group Home - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067 /CH0641
Title
Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - My Sister's Keeper
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0785 Recovery Residences - Condition of Acceptance of State Funds - Prohibition Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 /CH0584 Maryland Mental Health Law - Small Private Group Home - Definition Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1067 /CH0641 Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1111 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - My Sister's Keeper Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM