Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Group Homes -see also- Assisted Living

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092 (SB0145)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Samaritan House
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Bay Community Support Services Group Homes
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0445
Title
Health - Certified Recovery Residences - Urine Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551
Title
Recovery Residences - Condition of Acceptance of State Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 (SB0455)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928 (SB0796)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1130 /CH0503
Title
Residential Treatment Centers - Mandatory Reporting of Inappropriate Sexual Behavior
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1618 (SB0939)
Title
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1673 (SB1232)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Ranch
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 (HB0092)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Samaritan House
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 (HB0558)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home Renovations
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0796 (HB0928)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1618)
Title
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1232 (HB1673)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Ranch
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0092 (SB0145) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Samaritan House Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 AM
HB0443 Creation of a State Debt - Bay Community Support Services Group Homes Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0445 Health - Certified Recovery Residences - Urine Testing Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0551 Recovery Residences - Condition of Acceptance of State Funds - Prohibition Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0558 (SB0455) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home Renovations Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
HB0928 (SB0796) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 PM
HB1130 /CH0503 Residential Treatment Centers - Mandatory Reporting of Inappropriate Sexual Behavior Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1618 (SB0939) Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1673 (SB1232) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Ranch Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
SB0145 (HB0092) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Samaritan House Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0455 (HB0558) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home Renovations Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0796 (HB0928) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1618) Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1232 (HB1673) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Ranch Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM