Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0168/CH0196)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 /CH0094
Title
St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Requirements
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 (SB0265/CH0037)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 (SB0620)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809
Title
Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012 /CH0260 (SB0414/CH0259)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB0456)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481 (SB0557/CH0287)
Title
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0196 (HB0008)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0037 (HB0278)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 /CH0259 (HB1012/CH0260)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care Recipients
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450
Title
Education Trust Fund - Security Personnel and Equipment and Mental Health Services
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB1312)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 /CH0287 (HB1481)
Title
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 (HB0715)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0168/CH0196) Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits Delegate Vitale 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0257 /CH0094 St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Requirements St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0278 (SB0265/CH0037) Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0715 (SB0620) Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0809 Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from Disqualification Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB1012 /CH0260 (SB0414/CH0259) Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care Recipients Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1312 (SB0456) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1481 (SB0557/CH0287) Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0168 /CH0196 (HB0008) Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0037 (HB0278) Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 /CH0259 (HB1012/CH0260) Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care Recipients Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 Education Trust Fund - Security Personnel and Equipment and Mental Health Services Anne Arundel County Senators 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0456 (HB1312) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0557 /CH0287 (HB1481) Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0620 (HB0715) Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Senator Getty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM