Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 (SB0272/CH0151)
Title
Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051
Title
Public Schools - Boards of Education - Bullying Hotlines and Tip Boxes
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179 /CH0087
Title
Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283 (SB0034)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 /CH0096 (SB0396)
Title
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 /CH0400
Title
Special Education - Individualized Education Program Parental Notice Requirements and Service Models List
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427 /CH0403
Title
Education - Maryland Sudden Cardiac Arrest Awareness Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 /CH0100
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment of Minors
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0321/CH0291)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810
Title
Crimes - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults - Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958 (SB0411)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0283)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 /CH0039
Title
Family Law - Foster Care - Kinship Parent Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321 /CH0291 (HB0656)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 (HB0315/CH0096)
Title
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411 (HB0958)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681
Title
Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1093
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 (SB0272/CH0151) Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law) Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0051 Public Schools - Boards of Education - Bullying Hotlines and Tip Boxes Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0179 /CH0087 Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0283 (SB0034) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0315 /CH0096 (SB0396) Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Judiciary
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0413 /CH0400 Special Education - Individualized Education Program Parental Notice Requirements and Service Models List Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0427 /CH0403 Education - Maryland Sudden Cardiac Arrest Awareness Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0467 /CH0100 Labor and Employment - Employment of Minors Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0656 (SB0321/CH0291) Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Delegate Ready 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0810 Crimes - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults - Breach of Fiduciary Duty Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0958 (SB0411) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0034 (HB0283) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0144 /CH0039 Family Law - Foster Care - Kinship Parent Age Requirements Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0321 /CH0291 (HB0656) Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Senator Getty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0396 (HB0315/CH0096) Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0411 (HB0958) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Senator Forehand 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1093 State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM