Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Guns

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175
Title
Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200 (SB0479)
Title
Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415
Title
Firearms – Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry – Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0450 (SB0010)
Title
Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Mental Health Services - Expansion (Counselors Not Cops Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 (SB0190)
Title
Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 (HB0450)
Title
Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Notice of Expiration and Renewal Instructions
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 (HB0543)
Title
Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221
Title
Handgun Qualification License - Firearms Safety Training
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0245
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Requirements and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309
Title
Handgun Permit – Preliminary Approval
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479 (HB0200)
Title
Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0175 Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB0200 (SB0479) Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB0415 Firearms – Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry – Medical Cannabis Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB0450 (SB0010) Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0496 Primary and Secondary Education - Mental Health Services - Expansion (Counselors Not Cops Act) Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Ways and Means
HB0538 Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB0543 (SB0190) Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
SB0010 (HB0450) Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0015 Firearms - Handgun Permit - Notice of Expiration and Renewal Instructions Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0027 Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0190 (HB0543) Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0221 Handgun Qualification License - Firearms Safety Training Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0245 Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Requirements and Prohibitions Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0309 Handgun Permit – Preliminary Approval Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0479 (HB0200) Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 3:16 PM