Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Hagerstown

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0637/CH0188)
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1271 (SB0922/CH0210)
Title
City of Hagerstown - Alcoholic Beverages - Outdoor Festivals
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637 /CH0188 (HB1170)
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 /CH0210 (HB1271)
Title
City of Hagerstown - Alcoholic Beverages - Outdoor Festivals and Street Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1170 (SB0637/CH0188) Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1271 (SB0922/CH0210) City of Hagerstown - Alcoholic Beverages - Outdoor Festivals Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0637 /CH0188 (HB1170) Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 /CH0210 (HB1271) City of Hagerstown - Alcoholic Beverages - Outdoor Festivals and Street Festival Licenses Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page