Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Harassment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189
Title
Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against Employees
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 /CH0369 (SB1052)
Title
Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 /CH0373 (SB0504)
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0509
Title
Maryland False Claims Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0487)
Title
Home Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0698)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 (SB0567)
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324 (SB0396)
Title
Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts Void
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 (HB1324)
Title
Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts Void
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0603)
Title
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of Income
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 (HB0489/CH0373)
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 (HB0972)
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 (HB0735)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1052 (HB0396/CH0369)
Title
Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0189 Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against Employees Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0221 Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0396 /CH0369 (SB1052) Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law) Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0489 /CH0373 (SB0504) Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Expansion Delegate Mitchell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0509 Maryland False Claims Act of 2013 Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 (SB0487) Home Act of 2013 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0698) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0821 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0930 Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Delegate Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 (SB0567) Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 (SB0396) Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts Void Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0396 (HB1324) Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts Void Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB0603) Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of Income Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0504 (HB0489/CH0373) Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Expansion Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0567 (HB0972) Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 (HB0735) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1052 (HB0396/CH0369) Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law) Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM