Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 (SB0257)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Public Safety - Carbon Monoxide Poisoning - Portable Generators
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042
Title
Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 /CH0151
Title
Public Safety - Hotels and Lodging or Rooming Houses - Carbon Monoxide Alarms
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175
Title
Public Health - Sales Receipts Containing Bisphenol-A - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 (HB0381)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0458
Title
Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0859
Title
Lead - Risk Reduction Standard - Exemption for Affected Properties
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892
Title
Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0381 (SB0257) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0458 Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0825 Public Safety - Carbon Monoxide Poisoning - Portable Generators Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0952 Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0995 Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - Prohibition Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1042 Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of Exemptions Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 /CH0151 Public Safety - Hotels and Lodging or Rooming Houses - Carbon Monoxide Alarms Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0175 Public Health - Sales Receipts Containing Bisphenol-A - Prohibition Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0257 (HB0381) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0458 Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0859 Lead - Risk Reduction Standard - Exemption for Affected Properties Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM