Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 (SB0500)
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0801)
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Elevated Blood Lead Levels
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0479 (SB1066)
Title
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 /CH0246
Title
Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604
Title
Baltimore City Lead Remediation and Recovery Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655 (SB0392)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 (SB0046)
Title
Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 (SB0524)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080
Title
Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1722
Title
Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1765 /CH0585
Title
On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Watershed Implementation Plan and Bay Restoration Fund Disbursements and Financial Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 (HB0795)
Title
Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0655)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500 (HB0116)
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0852)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB0304)
Title
Environment – Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing – Elevated Blood Lead Levels
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 (HB0479)
Title
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0116 (SB0500) Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0304 (SB0801) Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Elevated Blood Lead Levels Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0479 (SB1066) Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0515 /CH0246 Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0604 Baltimore City Lead Remediation and Recovery Act Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0655 (SB0392) Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0719 On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Requirement Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0795 (SB0046) Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0852 (SB0524) Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1080 Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1722 Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1765 /CH0585 On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Watershed Implementation Plan and Bay Restoration Fund Disbursements and Financial Assistance Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 (HB0795) Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew’s Law) Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0392 (HB0655) Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 (HB0116) Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 (HB0852) Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB0304) Environment – Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing – Elevated Blood Lead Levels Senator Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1066 (HB0479) Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM