Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Benefit Exchange

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 (SB0134/CH0001)
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Plan - Access for Bridge Eligible Individuals
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 /CH0610 (SB0504)
Title
Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 /CH0613
Title
State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance Marketplace
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Enrollment of Individuals - Information
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1361
Title
Joint Committee to Review the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and Audit by the Office of Legislative Audits
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1509
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - State Reinsurance Program and Health Insurance Subsidy Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0023
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0001 (HB0119)
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Plan - Access for Bridge Eligible Individuals
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 (HB0693/CH0610)
Title
Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0667
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Universal Health Care Program - Plan for Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0119 (SB0134/CH0001) Maryland Health Insurance Plan - Access for Bridge Eligible Individuals Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/14/2014 - 12:00 PM
HB0169 Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0693 /CH0610 (SB0504) Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental Benefits Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0765 /CH0613 State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance Marketplace Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1268 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1336 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Enrollment of Individuals - Information Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1361 Joint Committee to Review the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and Audit by the Office of Legislative Audits Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1509 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - State Reinsurance Program and Health Insurance Subsidy Program Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Health and Government Operations
SB0096 /CH0023 Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0134 /CH0001 (HB0119) Maryland Health Insurance Plan - Access for Bridge Eligible Individuals President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Finance
1/14/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0504 (HB0693/CH0610) Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental Benefits Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0667 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Universal Health Care Program - Plan for Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM