Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Benefit Exchange

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0834)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1049
Title
Voter Registration Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB0949)
Title
Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured Marylanders
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0363
Title
Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0834 (HB0990)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0990 (SB0834) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1049 Voter Registration Act of 2015 Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 (HB0949) Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured Marylanders Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0363 Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0834 (HB0990) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM