Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Benefit Exchange

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0113
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Lymphedema Diagnosis, Evaluation, and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 /CH0321
Title
Termination of Maryland Health Insurance Plan, Transfer of Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program, and Funding for State Reinsurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0208 (SB0436/CH0207)
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0122
Title
Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 /CH0287
Title
Freedom to Vote Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318 /CH0309 (SB0929)
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357
Title
Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and Exceptions
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 /CH0510
Title
Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Freedom to Vote Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334
Title
Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350
Title
Universal Voter Registration Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0207 (HB0554/CH0208)
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 (HB1318/CH0309)
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0113 Health Insurance - Coverage for Lymphedema Diagnosis, Evaluation, and Treatment Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0489 /CH0321 Termination of Maryland Health Insurance Plan, Transfer of Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program, and Funding for State Reinsurance Program Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0554 /CH0208 (SB0436/CH0207) Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 /CH0122 Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1007 /CH0287 Freedom to Vote Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Ways and Means
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 /CH0309 (SB0929) Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1357 Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and Exceptions Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 /CH0510 Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0011 Freedom to Vote Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0350 Universal Voter Registration Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 /CH0207 (HB0554/CH0208) Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0929 (HB1318/CH0309) Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM