Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Benefit Exchange

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0355 (SB0036)
Title
Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378
Title
Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747
Title
Election Law – Links to Online Voter Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Individual Exchange - Copper Plans to Lower Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1098 /CH0401
Title
Health Insurance - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business Tax Credit Subsidy
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421 /CH0391
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 /CH0424 (HB0814/CH0423)
Title
Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0127 /CH0355 (SB0036) Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0378 Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0545 Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0747 Election Law – Links to Online Voter Registration Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0806 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Individual Exchange - Copper Plans to Lower Rates Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1098 /CH0401 Health Insurance - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business Tax Credit Subsidy Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1421 /CH0391 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 /CH0424 (HB0814/CH0423) Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM