Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Care Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105 /CH0083
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Powers - Authority to Award Funds and Make Agreements With Grantees and Payees
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 (SB0642)
Title
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 /CH0613
Title
State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779 /CH0614
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Care Provider-Carrier Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806 /CH0615
Title
Health Information Exchanges - Protected Health Information - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233 /CH0317 (SB0622/CH0316)
Title
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235 /CH0449
Title
Community Integrated Medical Home Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 /CH0316 (HB1233/CH0317)
Title
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0709)
Title
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 (HB1253)
Title
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 /CH0073
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Authority of Acute Care Hospitals to Provide Cardiac Surgery Services - Voluntary Relinquishment - Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 /CH0083 Maryland Health Care Commission - Powers - Authority to Award Funds and Make Agreements With Grantees and Payees Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Health and Government Operations
1/15/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0709 (SB0642) Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Termination Date Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0765 /CH0613 State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0779 /CH0614 Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Care Provider-Carrier Workgroup Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0806 /CH0615 Health Information Exchanges - Protected Health Information - Regulations Delegate Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1233 /CH0317 (SB0622/CH0316) Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 /CH0449 Community Integrated Medical Home Program Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0622 /CH0316 (HB1233/CH0317) Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 (HB0709) Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Termination Date Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0646 (HB1253) State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 /CH0073 Maryland Health Care Commission - Authority of Acute Care Hospitals to Provide Cardiac Surgery Services - Voluntary Relinquishment - Regulations Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM