Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Care Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 (SB0379)
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Economic Impact Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053
Title
Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516 (SB0750)
Title
Public Health - Health Record and Payment Clearing House - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379 (HB0932)
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 (HB1516)
Title
Public Health - Health Record and Payment Clearing House - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020
Title
Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Ways and Means
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0932 (SB0379) Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Economic Impact Statements Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1516 (SB0750) Public Health - Health Record and Payment Clearing House - Pilot Program Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0379 (HB0932) Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0750 (HB1516) Public Health - Health Record and Payment Clearing House - Pilot Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1020 Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017 Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM