Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health Care Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 /CH0230
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838
Title
Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926
Title
Hospitals and Freestanding Medical Facilities – Closing or Partial Closing – Public Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967
Title
Task Force to Study Privatization of the University of Maryland Medical System
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476
Title
Independent Oversight and Review Board for Health Care of Inmates in State Correctional Facilities - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1486 (SB0752)
Title
Public Health – Non–Controlled Substance Prescription Record System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1572
Title
Intermediate Care Facilities - Substance-Related Disorder Treatment Services - Review and Certificate of Need
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106
Title
Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exception for State-Owned Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 /CH0229
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501 /CH0403 (HB0998/CH0402)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB1486)
Title
Public Health - Non-Controlled Dangerous Substance Prescription Record System Program
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0512 /CH0230 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 230
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0838 Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project Study Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0926 Hospitals and Freestanding Medical Facilities – Closing or Partial Closing – Public Notice Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0967 Task Force to Study Privatization of the University of Maryland Medical System Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 Independent Oversight and Review Board for Health Care of Inmates in State Correctional Facilities - Establishment Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1486 (SB0752) Public Health – Non–Controlled Substance Prescription Record System Program Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1572 Intermediate Care Facilities - Substance-Related Disorder Treatment Services - Review and Certificate of Need Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0106 Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exception for State-Owned Facilities Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 /CH0229 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 229
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0501 /CH0403 (HB0998/CH0402) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding Senator Griffith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 403
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0752 (HB1486) Public Health - Non-Controlled Dangerous Substance Prescription Record System Program Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:16 PM