Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 /CH0106
Title
Health Insurance - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361 /CH0368
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 /CH0509 (SB0617/CH0508)
Title
Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0808 (SB0680)
Title
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001 (SB0585)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015 (SB0746)
Title
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 /CH0576 (SB0904/CH0575)
Title
Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216 /CH0289 (SB0581/CH0288)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization Forms
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0288 (HB1216/CH0289)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization Forms
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 (HB1001)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 /CH0508 (HB0716/CH0509)
Title
Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 (HB0808)
Title
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation Claims
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746 (HB1015)
Title
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 /CH0318
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Proposed Rate Increases - Notice to Insureds
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904 /CH0575 (HB1160/CH0576)
Title
Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0360 /CH0106 Health Insurance - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 /CH0368 Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0716 /CH0509 (SB0617/CH0508) Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist Agreements Delegate Tarrant 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0808 (SB0680) Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation Claims Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1001 (SB0585) Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1015 (SB0746) Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1160 /CH0576 (SB0904/CH0575) Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts Delegate Kach 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1216 /CH0289 (SB0581/CH0288) Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization Forms Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0581 /CH0288 (HB1216/CH0289) Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization Forms Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 (HB1001) Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0617 /CH0508 (HB0716/CH0509) Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist Agreements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Senator Conway 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0680 (HB0808) Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation Claims Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0746 (HB1015) Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0769 /CH0318 Health Benefit Plans - Proposed Rate Increases - Notice to Insureds Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 /CH0575 (HB1160/CH0576) Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM