Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0717)
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562 /CH0434 (SB0869)
Title
Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0450/CH0035)
Title
Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for Submission
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 (SB0241/CH0023)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0483 (SB0416/CH0482)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887 (SB0606/CH0372)
Title
Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010 (SB0586)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 (SB0871)
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Participating Pharmacies
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119
Title
Health Maintenance Organizations - Premium Tax and Transfer of Premium Tax Exemption Value - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0241 /CH0023 (HB0781)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - Required
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 /CH0482 (HB0838/CH0483)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 /CH0035 (HB0660)
Title
Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for Submission
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0363
Title
Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 (HB1010)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 /CH0041
Title
Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0606 /CH0372 (HB0887)
Title
Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717 (HB0422)
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB0562/CH0434)
Title
Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1140)
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Participating Pharmacies
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0422 (SB0717) Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0562 /CH0434 (SB0869) Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination Date Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 (SB0450/CH0035) Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for Submission Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0781 (SB0241/CH0023) Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - Required Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0838 /CH0483 (SB0416/CH0482) Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services Delegate Hill 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 (SB0606/CH0372) Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - Coverage Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1010 (SB0586) Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 (SB0871) Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Participating Pharmacies Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0119 Health Maintenance Organizations - Premium Tax and Transfer of Premium Tax Exemption Value - Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0241 /CH0023 (HB0781) Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - Required Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Finance
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0416 /CH0482 (HB0838/CH0483) Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 /CH0035 (HB0660) Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for Submission Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0363 Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0586 (HB1010) Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0596 /CH0041 Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0606 /CH0372 (HB0887) Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - Coverage Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0717 (HB0422) Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0869 (HB0562/CH0434) Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination Date Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0871 (HB1140) Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Participating Pharmacies Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM