Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123 /CH0070 (SB0003/CH0071)
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 (SB0084)
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 (SB0557)
Title
Suicide Treatment Improvements Act
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 (SB0393)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0731 (SB0567)
Title
Telehealth Services – Expansion
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0741)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910
Title
Health Insurance – Hearing Aids for Adults – Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0758)
Title
Health Insurance - Incentive Arrangements - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319
Title
Health Insurance - Lyme Disease and Related Tick-Borne Illnesses - Long-Term Antibiotic Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070)
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 (HB0135)
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272
Title
Insurance - Claim Payment - Clarification
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0551)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 (HB0442)
Title
Suicide Treatment Improvements Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 (HB0731)
Title
Telehealth Services - Expansion
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0836)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB1021)
Title
Health Insurance - Incentive Arrangements - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828
Title
HIV Prevention Drugs – Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0123 /CH0070 (SB0003/CH0071) Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Health and Government Operations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0135 (SB0084) Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act) Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0442 (SB0557) Suicide Treatment Improvements Act Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0551 (SB0393) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0731 (SB0567) Telehealth Services – Expansion Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0836 (SB0741) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB0910 Health Insurance – Hearing Aids for Adults – Coverage Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1021 (SB0758) Health Insurance - Incentive Arrangements - Authorization Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1319 Health Insurance - Lyme Disease and Related Tick-Borne Illnesses - Long-Term Antibiotic Treatment Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070) Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021 Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0084 (HB0135) Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0272 Insurance - Claim Payment - Clarification Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0393 (HB0551) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0557 (HB0442) Suicide Treatment Improvements Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0567 (HB0731) Telehealth Services - Expansion President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0741 (HB0836) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0758 (HB1021) Health Insurance - Incentive Arrangements - Authorization Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0828 HIV Prevention Drugs – Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page