Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Planning and Cost Review

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0263 (SB0335)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235 /CH0449
Title
Community Integrated Medical Home Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238 /CH0648
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Payment of Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Costa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0646)
Title
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 /CH0018
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Requirement for Certificate of Need - Exceptions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0298/CH0263)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 (HB1253)
Title
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0298 /CH0263 (SB0335) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 /CH0449 Community Integrated Medical Home Program Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1238 /CH0648 Developmental Disabilities Administration - Payment of Providers Delegate Costa 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1253 (SB0646) State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0089 /CH0018 Maryland Health Care Commission - Requirement for Certificate of Need - Exceptions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 (HB0298/CH0263) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0646 (HB1253) State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM