Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Planning and Cost Review

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754 /CH0400
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Cost Pricing and Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0754 /CH0400 Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Cost Pricing and Reimbursement Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM