Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Services Cost Review Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1073
Title
Task Force to Evaluate the Quality of Patient Care Under a Capitated Payment System
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1074
Title
Task Force to Evaluate the Impact of Maryland's Proposal to Maintain the Medicare Waiver
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1075
Title
State Medicare Waivers - Applications, Reapplications, Modifications, or Amendments - Legislative Approval Required
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1073 Task Force to Evaluate the Quality of Patient Care Under a Capitated Payment System Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1074 Task Force to Evaluate the Impact of Maryland's Proposal to Maintain the Medicare Waiver Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1075 State Medicare Waivers - Applications, Reapplications, Modifications, or Amendments - Legislative Approval Required Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM