Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Services Cost Review Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0263 (SB0335)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 /CH0613
Title
State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Task Force to Evaluate the Quality of Patient Care Under a Capitated Payment System
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 (SB0798)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0298/CH0263)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798 (HB1337)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0298 /CH0263 (SB0335) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0765 /CH0613 State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Task Force to Evaluate the Quality of Patient Care Under a Capitated Payment System Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1337 (SB0798) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0335 (HB0298/CH0263) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0798 (HB1337) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM